van Dyk, Jessie Grace (CPSO#: 90126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2017

Expiry Date:  20 Feb 2024

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St joseph's Health Centre
Level 3, Our Lady Of Mercy Wng
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6067
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Feb 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 16 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 20 Feb 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jessie Grace van Dyk may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. van Dyk holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. van Dyk no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report indicating  that  Dr.  van  Dyk's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive  an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. van Dyk's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  February 21, 2017.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 20, 2024.