van den Heuvel, Mathilda (CPSO#: 92573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Amsterdam, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 4168132814 Ext. 222814
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: van den Heuvel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bandsma ( CPSO# 89609 )
Dr. M. van den Heuvel ( CPSO# 92573 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 22 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 23 Apr 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mathilda van den Heuvel may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. van den Heuvel
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. van den Heuvel no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. van den Heuvel's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  van den Heuvel's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following  consideration   of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2016.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs  2  and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2023.