van der Merwe, Da-elene (CPSO#: 81971)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Pretoria, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 05 Nov 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Biochemistry

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2012 to 09 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2005