van der Pol, Christian Balthasar (CPSO#: 95958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road Suite #103
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8
Canada
Phone: 905-387-4551
Fax: (905) 387-1966
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Nelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Van Der Pol ( CPSO# 95958 )
Dr. J. Nelli ( CPSO# 95778 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8


Corporation Name: Christian van der Pol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Van Der Pol ( CPSO# 95958 )
Dr. J. Nelli ( CPSO# 95778 )

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 103
Mississauga ON  L5M 1P3

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN BALTHASAR VAN DER POL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER POL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016