van der Vyver, Marthinus Johannes (CPSO#: 74591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KENSINGTON CANCER SCREENING CLINIC
340 COLLEGE STREET
SUITE 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: (416) 928-9513
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin van der Vyver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. van der Vyver ( CPSO# 74591 )

Business Address:
Suite 601
College Street 340
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-6100

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Suite M3
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-1504

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHINUS JOHANNES VAN DER VYVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER VYVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2006