Regulated Clinic Inspections Detail

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

<<Back to Listing

Brampton Endoscopy Centre

Current Business Address:
10886 Hurontario Street
Suite A7
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Sep 24, 2018 Pending
Jun 08, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 04, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 01, 2017 Pass View PDF
Sep 20, 2012 Pass View PDF

Need Assistance?


Call the Public & Physician Advisory Service, weekdays from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m., 416-967-2603  or  1-800-268-7096 ext 603

Email us

 

Get Adobe Reader

You must have Adobe Reader installed in order to view PDF documents.