Council Updates

  • 2018

    May 24-25, 2018

    06/06/2018 Council Award Presented to Dr. Sarah Reid; Continuity of Care - Draft for Consultation; Bill 87: Psychotherapy Regulation Proposal; Rescindment of Methadone By-Law; Governance Review

    February 23, 2018

    01/03/2018 Council Award Presented to Dr. Bill Wong; Policy Consultation on Closing a Medical Practice; College Releases Interim Opioid Investigation Update; Governance Review; Increase in Costs Ordered in Discipline Hearings; Reporting a Change of Scope, Re-entering Practice; Public Health Emergencies; Continuity of Care and Test Results Management Policy Development; Fee Increase Approved

  • 2017

    November 30 - December 1, 2017

    06/12/2017 New College President; Dr. Kenneth Fung receives Council Award; Uninsured Services: Billing and Block Fees Policy Approved; 2018 Budget; Registration Pathways Program Evaluation; Bill 160, Schedule 9 Oversight of Health Facilities and Devices Act, 2017 ; Prescribing Drugs – Preliminary Consultation; Find out how your opioid prescribing compares to your peers

    September 8, 2017

    14/09/2017 Council Award winner; interim opioid strategy; new consultations; facilitating public member presidents; new member orientation; four district 10 physicians acclaimed to Council; Annual Report

    May 25-26, 2017

    31/05/2017 Dr. Gary Smith Receives Council Award; Opioid Strategy; Preliminary Consultation Underway; Two Policies Updated; Other News

    February 24, 2017

    02/03/2017 Dr. Shazia Ambreen Receives Council Award; Have Your Say on Uninsured Services Policy; Bill 87 - The Protecting Patients' Act; Fertility Clinic Oversight; Other News

  • 2016

    December 1-2, 2016

    07/12/2016 New CPSO President; Council Award Winner; Have Your Say; Policy Updates; Revised OHPIP Standards

    September 8-9, 2016

    14/09/2016 100th Physician Honoured with Council Award; Council responds to Sexual Abuse Task Force recommendations; CPSO Consultations; By-law Amendments Approved; Safeguarding our Communities Act (Patch for Patch Return Policy)

    May 30-31, 2016

    07/06/2016 Port Colborne FP presented with Council Award; Policy Updates; New Consultations; Compensation of Public Members; Transparency Initiative – QA SCERPs to be posted

    February 26, 2016

    02/03/2016 Council Award Winner; Policy Updates; Fee Increase Approved

    January 26, 2016

    02/02/2016 Interim Guidance on PAD

  • 2015

    December 3-4, 2015

    09/12/2015 Dr. Joel Kirsh, New President of CPSO; Council Award Winner; Consultations; Policy Updates; Other News

    September 10-11, 2015

    18/09/2015 Dr. Andrew Stadnyk, Council Award recipient; Sexual Abuse Prevention; Updated Policy: Planning for and Providing Quality End-of-Life Care; Physician-assisted Dying; Consultation on Revised Blood Borne Viruses Policy; Preliminary Consultation on Block Fees and Uninsured Services Policy; 2014 Annual Report

    May 28-29, 2015

    09/06/2015 Dr. Craig Campbell, Council Award recipient; CPSO Initiatives; Consent to Treatment; Policies for Consultation; Other News

    March 6, 2015

    11/03/2015 Dr. Rosemary Moodie, Council Award Recipient; Two Policies Approved; Fees and Remuneration By-law; External Reviews of the College; Quality Management Partnership Report

  • 2014

    December 4-5, 2014

    11/12/2014 Dr. Carol Leet, New College President; Dr. Robin McLeod, Council Award Recipient; Transparency Initiative; Reviewing practices, sexual abuse legislation to better support patients; Draft Policies Approved for Consultation; Telemedicine Policy Approved; 2015 Budget Approved; Physicians to be honoured with Council Award

    September 4-5, 2014

    11/09/2014 Dr. Duncan Bull, Council Award Recipient; Have Your Say on New Consultations; New CPSO Policy; Release of CPSO Data; Other Initiatives

    May 29-30, 2014

    04/06/2014 Council Award to Dr. Helen Ward; Provide Feedback on New Consultations; Transparency Initiative; Registration Policy Update; Other News

    March 7, 2014

    12/03/2014 Council Award to Dr. Keyna Bracken; Consultation Updates; New Consultation; Quality Management Partnership; Other News

Subscribe to Patient Compass!