News Release

2018 - 06 - 27 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Ranjit Kumar Chandra; Dr. Troy Christie Drone; Dr. Stephen Charles Huebel; Dr. Paul King Shuen; Dr. Erez Tamari; Dr. Michael Clarence Tjandrawidjaja

Jun 27, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Chandra, Dr. Ranjit Kumar
No practice address (formerly of Mississauga, Etobicoke, Scarborough and Brampton)

On December 8, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ranjit Kumar Chandra committed an act of professional misconduct, but reserved its penalty decision. June 18, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Kumar’s certificate of registration be revoked; that he appear before the panel to be reprimanded; that he pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the amount of $35,000; and pay the costs of the discipline proceeding in the amount of $16,500. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Chandra’s profile.

Drone, Dr. Troy Christie
Kitchener

On June 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Troy Christie Drone committed an act of professional misconduct. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Drone’s certificate of registration be suspended for one month; that he appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and pay the costs of the discipline proceeding in the amount of $6,000. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Drone’s profile.

Huebel, Dr. Stephen Charles
No practice address (formerly of Scarborough)

On June 7, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Stephen Charles Huebel committed an act of professional misconduct. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Huebel’s certificate of registration be suspended for three months; that he appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay the costs of the discipline proceeding in the amount of $10,180. In addition, a series of conditions were imposed on his certificate of registration. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Huebel’s profile.

Shuen, Dr. Paul King
No practice address (formerly of North York)

On April 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Paul King Shuen committed an act of professional misconduct. On June 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Shuen’s certificate of registration be revoked; that he appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and that he pay the costs of the discipline proceeding in the amount of $40,720. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Shuen’s profile.

Tamari, Dr. Erez
No practice address (formerly of Mississauga)

On June 13, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Erez Tamari committed an act of professional misconduct. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Tamari’s certificate of registration be suspended for six months; that he appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and pay the costs of the discipline proceeding in the amount of $10,180. In addition, a series of conditions were imposed on his certificate of registration. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Tamari’s profile.

Tjandrawidjaja, Dr. Michael Clarence
Brampton/Toronto

On June 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Michael Clarence Tjandrawidjaja committed an act of professional misconduct. In response, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Tjandrawidjaja appear before the panel to be reprimanded; and pay the costs of the discipline proceeding in the amount of $6,000. A full summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available at Dr. Tjandrawidjaja’s profile.