News Release

2018 - 09 - 12 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Adel Abduselam Abdurahman; Dr. Christopher Stephen Doyle; Dr. Ayoob Mossanen; Dr. William Warren Hethrington Rudd

Sep 12, 2018

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Abdurahman, Dr. Adel Abduselam
Cornwall (formerly of Sault Ste. Marie)

On February 9, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Abdurahman committed an act of professional misconduct. On August 13, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Abdurahman be suspended for nine months, effective immediately and that he appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded. The Committee further ordered that Dr. Abdurahman complete a course in professionalism and ethics approved by the College; and that Dr. Abdurahman may practice only under the supervision of a College-approved Clinical Supervisor for a period of five years. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Abdurahman’s profile.

Doyle, Dr. Christopher Stephen
No practice address (formerly of Mississauga)

On February 1, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Doyle committed an act of professional misconduct and found Dr. Doyle incompetent. On August 7, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Doyle’s certificate of registration be revoked effective immediately; that he appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded; and that he pay costs to the College in the amount of $16,500. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Doyle’s profile.

Mossanen, Dr. Ayoob
No practice address (formerly of Toronto)

On August 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ayoob Mossanen committed an act of professional misconduct and contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration. On August 7, 2018, Dr. Mossanen entered into an Undertaking with the College, wherein he acknowledged that he resigned from the College and undertook not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. On August 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Mossanen attend before the panel to be reprimanded and pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Mossanen’s profile.

Rudd, Dr. William Warren Hethrington
No practice address (formerly of Toronto)

On August 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rudd committed an act of professional misconduct. Dr. Rudd entered into an undertaking to the College on May 7, 2018, by which he agreed to resign his certificate of registration, effective May 25, 2018. On August 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Rudd attend before the panel to be reprimanded and pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00. A summary of the Discipline Committee’s findings and penalty are available on the public register at Dr. Rudd’s profile.