THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/09/2018 12:07:51 AM

Braidek, Jessica Lynne (CPSO#: 100438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 4568
Fax: 416-586-8654
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Braidek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA LYNNE BRAIDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIDEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 06 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 06 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2018