THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/07/2018 10:20:10 AM

Nagra, Karan Singh (CPSO#: 103966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Four Corners Health Centre
7205 Goreway Dr, Unit 75
Mississauga, Ontario, L4T2T9
Malton ON  L4T2T9
Phone: 905-677-9599
Fax: 905-677-9698
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nagra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nagra ( CPSO# 103966)

Business Address:
Four Corners Health Centre
224-40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 677-9599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARAN SINGH NAGRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017