THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/11/2018 11:30:19 AM

Reiser, Erika (CPSO#: 108138)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Nov 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2016