THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/10/2018 5:46:40 AM

Roos, Adrienne Margaret (CPSO#: 108725)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 May 2016 to 03 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2016