THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 26/09/2018 5:25:54 AM

McLachlin, John Adam (CPSO#: 12214)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Mar-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1940

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1986