THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 24/06/2018 12:16:29 PM

Carey, Beverly Jane (CPSO#: 13773)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002