THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/02/2019 9:44:58 PM

Olivier, Joseph Henri Jacques (CPSO#: 16814)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 7-Sep-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pathology and Bacteriology Effective: 01 Jan 1948 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1994