THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 2:05:28 PM

De Kenedy, Geyza Leslie (CPSO#: 17640)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Oct-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical University of Szeged, 1939

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1989