THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 4:22:32 AM

Ostime, Maurice James (CPSO#: 18547)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 12-May-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 1995