THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 12/11/2018 9:16:43 PM

Golab, Alexander (CPSO#: 18703)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 1996