THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 8:24:13 PM

Scott, Michael Allan (CPSO#: 18849)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1963
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 1991