THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 1:08:58 PM

Lackey, Allison Wellsford (CPSO#: 18873)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2007