THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/11/2018 8:19:32 PM

Macaulay, Donald Norman (CPSO#: 19430)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Date of Death: 17-Jan-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006