THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 8:42:43 PM

Weston, Walter Wayne (CPSO#: 19590)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact: Byron Family Medical Centre 1228 Commissioner's Road West London, ON N6K 1C7
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013


Address: Medical records requests should be forwarded to: Byron Family Medical Centre 1228 Commissioner's Road West London, ON N6K 1C7
Date Received: 03 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1969 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013