THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 7:45:18 PM

Hayes, Herbert Nathan Gillis (CPSO#: 19721)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Date of Death: 15-Dec-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital 1230 North Shore Boulevard Burlington, Ontario L7S 1W7
Date Received: 18 May 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011