THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 18/08/2018 12:20:23 PM

Lee, John York Hon (CPSO#: 20633)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests for medical records should be directed to the Trenton Memorial Hospital.
Date Received: 16 May 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 12 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007