THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 6:57:54 AM

Houze, Graham Neal (CPSO#: 20656)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 2010