THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/03/2019 10:49:22 AM

Stanley, Gerald Norman (CPSO#: 21007)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2003

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Feb-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2003