THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 4:19:17 AM

Hyde, Byron Marshall (CPSO#: 21364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
121 Iona Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 3M1
Phone: (613) 722-5555
Fax: (613) 729-0148
Electoral District: 07

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Nov 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 09 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Nov 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Hyde’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Hyde is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. In addition to the foregoing, it is also alleged that Dr. Hyde engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to in relation to his charitable foundation, billing for uninsured services, in his communications with patients and others, inappropriate OHIP billing, and failure to maintain appropriate boundaries with a staff member.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)

            As of November 22, 2018, Dr. Hyde has not obtained a Clinical Supervisor and
            shall not prescribe (and shall not authorize any refills or renewals of
            prescriptions for) Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
            Benzodiazepines or Other Targeted Substances and/or any other Monitored Drugs

            (2 of 2)

            As from 12:01 a.m., November 9, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Byron Marshall Hyde:

            (1)   Dr. Hyde shall engage a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College at
                  his own expense (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"),
                  ("Clinical Supervision"). who shall:

                  (a)   Meet with Dr. Hyde at his Practice Location, or another location
                        approved by the College, once every three months.  The first
                        meeting must take place in person. The remaining meetings may take
                        place via secure videoconferencing technology approved by the
                        College;
                  
                  (b)   Review at every meeting the charts of ten (10) patients (or if that
                        is not possible, a lesser number agreed to by the College) to whom
                        Dr. Hyde prescribes or administers Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines or Other Targeted
                        Substances and/or any other Monitored Drugs, which shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor independent of Dr. Hyde's
                        participation.
                  
                  (c)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                  (d)   Provide reports to the College at least after every meeting, in
                        reasonable detail, containing all information to assist the College
                        in evaluating Dr. Hyde's standard of practice, as well as his
                        participation in and compliance with the terms of the Order; and
                  
                  (e)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or
                        conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical
                        Supervisor deems necessary to Dr. Hyde's Clinical Supervision.
                  
            (2)   Dr. Hyde shall ensure that Appendix "E" to the Order, is signed and
                  delivered to the College within fourteen (14) days of the date the Order
                  is effective. If Dr. Hyde has not delivered an undertaking signed by a
                  Clinical Supervisor to the College by this date, Dr. Hyde shall not
                  prescribe (and shall not authorize any refills or renewals of
                  prescriptions for) Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                  Drugs, Benzodiazepines or Other Targeted Substances and/or any other
                  Monitored Drugs, and the fact of this restriction shall be a term,
                  condition or limitation on his Certificate of Registration.

            (3)   Dr. Hyde shall cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of his
                  practice, conducted under the term of the Order and Appendix "E"
                  attached, and to abide by the recommendations of the Clinical
                  Supervisor(s), including with respect to patient care, practice
                  improvements, and continuing education. For greater certainty though
                  without limiting the foregoing, if during or after an observation of a
                  patient encounter or a chart review the Clinical Supervisor is of the
                  view that any conduct or care on Dr. Hyde's part will put a patient or
                  patients at risk, Dr. Hyde shall immediately comply with any
                  recommendations made by the Clinical Supervisor to protect the patient(s)
                  from risk.

            (4)   If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking as attached at
                  Appendix "E" to the Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill
                  its provisions, Dr. Hyde shall, within fourteen (14) days of receiving
                  notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                  similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure
                  that it is delivered to the College within that time.

            (5)   If Dr. Hyde is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the terms set
                  out in section (4) above, Dr. Hyde shall not prescribe (and shall not
                  authorize any refills or renewals of prescriptions for) Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines or Other
                  Targeted Substances and/or any other Monitored Drugs, and the fact of
                  this restriction shall be a term, condition or limitation on his
                  certificate of registration.

            (6)   Dr. Hyde shall keep a log of all prescriptions for, and all refills or
                  renewals of prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                  Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and all
                  other Monitored Drugs in the form attached as set out in Appendix "F",
                  which will include at least the following information (the "Prescribing
                  Log"):

                  (a)   the date of the appointment;
                  
                  (b)   the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  
                  (c)   the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency; and
                  
                  (d)   Dr. Hyde's signature.
                  
            (7)   Dr. Hyde shall keep a copy of all prescriptions he writes and a copy of
                  all refills or renewals of prescriptions he authorizes for Narcotic
                  Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and all other Monitored Drugs in the corresponding
                  patient chart.

            (8)   Dr. Hyde shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Order,
                  provide the College with the addresses of each and every location where
                  he practises or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any
                  hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with
                  which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively "Practice
                  Locations").  On an ongoing basis, Dr. Hyde shall inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (9)   Dr. Hyde shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor and
                  by staff at any location where Dr. Hyde practices to the College of all
                  information necessary to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                  and to monitor and facilitate Dr. Hyde's compliance with the Order.

            (10)  Dr. Hyde shall cooperate with any inspection of his practice location(s)
                  by the College, which may be made without notice and which may include
                  but not be limited to reviews of patient charts and/or other records and
                  to interviews of hospital staff and staff at any location where Dr. Hyde
                  practices, in order to monitor his compliance with the Order. Dr. Hyde
                  shall consent to the disclosure by the College to his Clinical
                  Supervisor, to the Chief of his department at any hospital and to the
                  Medical Director and/or Quality Advisor of any location where he
                  practices of all information deemed by the College to be necessary to
                  monitor or facilitate Dr. Hyde's compliance with the Order.

            (11)  Dr. Hyde shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Order,
                  provide to the College his irrevocable consent in the forms attached at
                  Appendix "G" and Appendix "H" for the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), and the Drug
                  Program Services Branch - Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented
                  under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, to monitor his
                  compliance with the terms of the Order

            (12)  Dr. Hyde shall be responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges,
                  and expenses arising from the implementation of the Order.