THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 26/09/2018 4:23:55 AM

Rankin, John Thomas (CPSO#: 22576)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008