THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 19/08/2018 12:21:59 AM

Foster, John Kevin (CPSO#: 22856)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Safestor Records Management 2704 Hwy 20 Fonthill, ON L0S 1E6
Date Received: 22 May 2018


Instructions: Dr. Foster's medical records will be stored at Safestor. Tel: (905) 892-0010
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018