THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 10:19:37 AM

Zoberman, Lawrence (CPSO#: 23616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Zoberman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 7 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ZOBERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOBERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1971