THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 6:01:48 AM

Kaminski, Michael (CPSO#: 26716)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Polish, Russian

Education:Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 205, 4949 Bathurst Street, North York, ON M2R 1Y1, (416) 225-8809
Instructions: Records are in the care of Dr. Anna Fernando
Date Received: 26 Nov 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Mar 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Mar 2018
Summary:

On March 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Michael Kaminski committed an 
act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Michael Kaminski is a family medicine physician who practised in Toronto.  
 
Cease to Practice Undertaking 
 
On June 10 of 2015, Dr. Kaminski executed a Cease to Practice undertaking (“the June 2015 
Undertaking”), by which he voluntarily agreed to cease practising medicine in any jurisdiction 
until particular conditions had been met including: 
 
-  Providing a minimum of forty-five days’ notice to the College of his intent to return to the 
   practice of medicine;  
-  Providing the College with proof that he is participating in a program of continuing 
   professional development that meets the requirements for continuing professional 
   development of the College of Family Physicians of Canada, and 
-  Approval by the College of Dr. Kaminski’s return to the practice of medicine. 
       
Pursuant to the June 2015 Undertaking, Dr. Kaminski also undertook to forward a request to the 
General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP’) that his billing number be 
deactivated for services rendered after the date on which  he would cease to practise. He further 
undertook to abide by the College’s Policy on Practice Management Considerations for 
Physicians Who Cease to Practice, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice 
Due to Relocation.  

Dr. Kaminski consented to certain terms of the June 2015 Undertaking being deemed to be 
specified terms, conditions and limitations imposed upon his certificate of registration.  
Specifically the following became a term, condition and limitation upon his certificate: “Dr 
Michael Kaminski has voluntarily ceased to practice medicine in all jurisdictions effective May 
30, 2015.” 

Investigation 

In May of 2016, a Senior Investigative Analyst in Risk Management with Manulife Financial 
emailed the College expressing concern that Dr. Kaminski was practising medicine, contrary to 
the restriction on his certificate.  The Analyst identified that Dr. Kaminski was practising at a 
clinic called "Skin Med Clinic".  Enclosed with her email was a copy of a prescription signed by 
Dr. Kaminski dated March 31, 2016, for compression stockings, thigh high and knee high with 
instructions to wear for daily activities for varicose veins.   

A further complaint about Dr. Kaminski, from a pharmacist, was received in May of 2016.  The 
pharmacist complained that Dr. Kaminski was writing prescriptions even though he is restricted 
from practicing medicine.  

In July of 2016, Dr. Kaminski spoke with a College investigator. Dr. Kaminski indicated that he 
                                      1 
 
was not aware that he could not practice and apologized.  

In response to a summons, Manulife Financial provided claim documents related to Dr. 
Kaminski including a summary document together with prescriptions and consultation notes for 
19 patients written by Dr. Kaminski during the time he was restricted from practising. The 
prescriptions range from May 30, 2015 to April 7, 2016.  

Failure to Renew 

Dr. Kaminski’s certificate of registration expired in August of 2016 as a result of a failure to 
renew. 

DISPOSITION 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that: 
-  The Registrar revoke Dr. Kaminski’s certificate of registration effective immediately. 
-  Dr. Kaminski, within six (6) months, to pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the amount of 
   $5,500.00, and Dr. Kaminski to provide proof of this payment to the Registrar of the College. 
-  Dr. Kaminski appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Kaminski pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500 within 30 days of the date of 
   this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 15, 2018


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Aug 1993
Summary:

 In August 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kaminski guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Kaminski be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register, and that he be fined $5000.00.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Dec 1992