THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/02/2019 8:24:34 PM

Winters, Virginia Elaine (CPSO#: 27118)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 17 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011