THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/02/2019 8:43:55 PM

Ng, Anthony Tsun-Hung (CPSO#: 27247)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hospital Medical Records Office Room 1926, 1st Floor, B Wing 10 Trench Street Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Apr 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016