THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 3:17:49 AM

Pinto, Anthony Joseph (CPSO#: 27925)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Bombay, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 1(888)563-3732 ext. 1
Instructions: Online requests can be made at www.getmymedrecord.ca
Date Received: 17 Jun 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016