THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 1:17:17 PM

Nolan, Kevin Joseph Martin (CPSO#: 27985)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 301 Monterey Drive Ottawa, ON K2H 7B1
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015