THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 4:24:35 AM

Beattie, Robert Alan (CPSO#: 28645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Nov 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert A. Beattie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beattie ( CPSO# 28645 )
Dr. E. Beattie ( CPSO# 90571 )

Business Address:
Parklane Plaza
Unit 8A
815 High Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 742-2112

Business Address:
Bell Tower Plaza
365 North Front Street
Unit 15A
Belleville ON  K8P 5A5
Phone Number: (613) 967-2228

Business Address:
1414 King Street East
Unit 32
Courtice ON  L1E 3B4
Phone Number: (905) 743-0090

Medical Records Location

Address: 9631 Hwy 62 N RR4 Stirling ON K0K 3E0
Date Received: 06 Nov 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 2018