THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 11/12/2018 4:31:51 PM

Devilla Jr, Guillermo O'Hara (CPSO#: 30000)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Date of Death: 27-Feb-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005