THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 7:26:13 AM

Sullovey, Carl Aaron (CPSO#: 30648)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Group, (647) 722-2370. Records Access Services Canada Inc., 1-(800) 971-8038.
Instructions: Contact Appletree Medical Group for electronic records and mention that you were a previous patient of Dr. Sullovey. Contact Records Access Services Canada Inc. for a copy of old paper charts prior to April 2012.
Date Received: 28 Sep 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017