THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 3:16:03 AM

Payton, Keith Bramwell (CPSO#: 31017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith Payton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Payton ( CPSO# 31017 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: After June 30, 2018 medical records for Dr. Payton will be stored at: Command Services London (Ltd) 100 Piccadilly St London, ON N6A 1R8 Phone: 519-672-1460
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH BRAMWELL PAYTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1984