THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/02/2019 9:55:30 PM

Mullins, Geoffrey Charles (CPSO#: 33651)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2006