THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/11/2018 3:19:45 PM

Niranjan, Vijaya (CPSO#: 33693)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2004

Summary

Date of Death: 13-Oct-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Osmania University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2004