THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/10/2018 2:59:47 PM

Bondy, Gregory Paul (CPSO#: 33756)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 1992