THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/08/2018 11:46:20 PM

Gold, Jonathan Allan (CPSO#: 50751)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991