THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 3:19:20 AM

Myers, Miriam (CPSO#: 51145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 882-7575
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

doctor's office
Royal Bank Plaza
Toronto Ontario
Toronto ON  M5X 1A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-6787
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miriam Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Myers ( CPSO# 51145 )

Business Address:
200 Bay Street
Lower Level
Toronto ON  M5J 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 368-6787

Business Address:
206 - 2900 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 882-7575

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987