THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 4:42:10 AM

Vago, Agnes (CPSO#: 52028)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Sciences,Debrecen, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto East General Hospital Pathology Department 825 Coxwell Ave East York, ON M4C 3E7
Date Received: 14 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018