THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 3:55:48 AM

Morassutti, Dante Joseph (CPSO#: 52699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 1106 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone: (519) 973-8771
Fax: (519) 973-4690
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dante Morassutti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morassutti ( CPSO# 52699 )

Business Address:
205 - 1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9C 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 973-8771

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 30, 2015
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 30, 2015, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College that Dr. Dante Joseph Morassutti's privileges were suspended, effective June 29, 2015.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANTE JOSEPH MORASSUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORASSUTTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2007