THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 24/06/2018 6:28:21 PM

Berger, Samuel Mark (CPSO#: 53006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2120B Hwy 51
Mindemoya
Ontario
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone: 705-3775371
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
USA - New York

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL MARK BERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1984