THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/08/2018 3:01:27 AM

Adesanya, Arinola Oluwatoyin (CPSO#: 53771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Program
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4110
Fax: (416) 521-4122
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 304B
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-5400
Fax: (905) 848-5404
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arinola Adesanya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adesanya ( CPSO# 53771 )

Business Address:
Suite 304B
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 848-5400

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 01 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARINOLA OLUWATOYIN ADESANYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADESANYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1987