THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 21/06/2018 6:08:43 AM

Nguyen, Chau (CPSO#: 54037)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1996